IL SB2844 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-8)
Status: Passed on August 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0982
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-8)
Status: Passed on August 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0982
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Requires the State Board of Education to establish and maintain the Growing Future Educators Program to train high school graduates who at one time have been identified as English learners and who are enrolled in an approved educator preparation program, among other qualifications, to become secondary language educators. Provides that each school district that chooses to participate in the Program shall partner with one public, regionally accredited institution of higher education in this State that offers a pre-approved educator preparation program and each qualified high school graduate participating in the program through the district must be enrolled at that institution in its educator preparation program. Provides that for each semester that a qualified high school graduate is participating in the program, the State Board shall issue the person a paraprofessional educator endorsement on an Educator License with Stipulations and the person must be employed as a part-time employee by the participating district as a paraprofessional working under the supervision of a district employee with a Professional Educator License. Sets forth provisions concerning funding, submitting program data, reporting to the General Assembly, and rulemaking. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-GROWING FUTURE EDUCATOR
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-19 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0982 |
2018-08-19 | Senate | Effective Date August 19, 2018 |
2018-08-19 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 053-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 007-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2018 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2018-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-29 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-29 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-29 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 008-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 008-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2018-05-28 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-05-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2018-05-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2018-05-28 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-28 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-04-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2018-04-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 045-000-000 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Aquino |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 012-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2018 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 009-000-000 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. John F. Curran |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 2-3.173 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 21B-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |