IL SB2839 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that notwithstanding any other law to the contrary, the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall not adopt any rule or enter into any contract that prohibits reimbursement under the medical assistance program to an eligible clinic for a dental encounter for services performed by an individual licensed to practice dentistry or dental hygiene under the Illinois Dental Practice Act. Effective immediately.
Title
MEDICAID-DENTAL ENCOUNTER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 007-000-000 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2839&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2839.htm |