IL SB2839 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Historic Preservation Agency Act. Expands the list of State Historic Sites to include (i) Apple River Fort State Historic Site, Jo Daviess County; (ii) the Crenshaw House State Historic Site, Gallatin County; (iii) the Lewis and Clark State Historic Site, Madison County; (iv) the Martin Boismenue House State Historic Site, St. Clair County; and (v) the World War II Memorial, Sangamon County. Changes the name of the Amistad Commission to the Amistad and Freedom Trail Commission. Requires the Commission to prepare a master plan to promote and preserve the history of the African slave trade, slavery in America, the vestiges of slavery in this country, the freedom trail and underground railroad in the State, and the contributions of African-Americans to our society. Requires the Commission (i) to assist in developing partnerships to seek public and private funds to carry out events memorializing the freedom trail and underground railroad and (ii) to assist in and promote the making of applications for inclusion in the National Park Service's National Underground Railroad Network to Freedom Program. Makes changes to provisions concerning Commission members; the administration of the Lincoln Presidential Library; and the Office of the Internal Auditor of the Historic Preservation Agency. Repeals a provision creating the Freedom Trail Commission. Amends the Illinois Historic Preservation Act. Reduces the number of members on the Illinois Historic Sites Advisory Council from 15 to 11 and makes other changes. Amends the School Code. Changes a reference to "Amistad Commission" to "Amistad and Freedom Trail Commission. Repeals the Local Legacy Act.
Title
IHPA-AMISTAD&FREDOM TRAIL COMM
Sponsors
Sen. Pamela Althoff [R] | Sen. Steven Landek [D] | Sen. William McCann [R] | Rep. John Bradley [D] |
Rep. David Harris [R] | Rep. John Cavaletto [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-12-03 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-12-02 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. John E. Bradley |
2014-12-02 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2014-12-02 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
2014-12-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-12-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2014-12-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2014-12-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-004-000 |
2014-12-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-12-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-12-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John E. Bradley |
2014-12-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-12-01 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2014-05-30 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-23 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 30, 2014 |
2014-05-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2014-05-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2014-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2014-05-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 020-000-000 |
2014-04-23 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2014-03-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-04 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2014-03-04 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 26, 2014 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 25, 2014 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 010-000-000 |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-01-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 27-20.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3405 | 20 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3405 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3405 | 33 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3405 | 34 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3405 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3410 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3988 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |