IL SB2839 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0801
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0801
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Boat Registration and Safety Act. Provides that certain provisions concerning flotation devices shall not apply to sailboards (instead of sailboats).
Title
BOAT REG-FLOTATION:SAILBOARDS
Sponsors
Sen. John Mulroe [D] | Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-13 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0801 |
2012-07-13 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2013 |
2012-07-13 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2012-06-13 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2012-05-15 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2012-05-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2012-05-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 012-000-000 |
2012-02-27 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2012-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-23 | House | First Reading |
2012-02-09 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2012-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-02-09 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-02-09 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 040-000-000 |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 9, 2012 |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 8, 2012 |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 008-000-000 |
2012-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2012-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 45 | 4-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |