IL SB2838 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-27 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Riverboat Gambling Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GAMING-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-27 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2010-03-19 Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2010
2010-03-12 Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 15, 2010
2010-03-12 Second Reading
2010-03-08 Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2010
2010-03-08 Do Pass Executive; 009-000-000
2010-02-25 Assigned to Executive
2010-01-28 Referred to Assignments
2010-01-28 First Reading
2010-01-28 Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2010-01-28 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback