IL SB2830 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Failed on November 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-29 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Failed on November 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-29 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Requires that the trustees for the Fox Metro Water Reclamation District be elected at consolidated elections. Provides that where a nomination for election is to be made for a trustee of the Fox Metro Water Reclamation District, then the petition shall be filed in the office of the county clerk not more than 113 nor less than 106 days prior to the date of the primary. Amends the Sanitary District Act of 1917. Provides that the board of trustees of the Fox Metro Water Reclamation District shall be elected (rather than appointed) beginning with the 2019 election. Sets forth requirements concerning the number of trustees to be elected and length of terms. Effective immediately.
Title
FOX METRO WATER RECLAMATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-14 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 50 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 66 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 66 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-29 | Senate | Total Veto Stands |
2018-11-26 | House | Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-11-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Total Veto |
2018-11-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Override Governor Veto - Senate Passed 050-005-000 |
2018-11-14 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Placed Calendar Total Veto November 14, 2018 |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Governor Vetoed |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-30 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Robert Martwick |
2018-05-30 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Sue Scherer |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 066-049-000 |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; 010-005-000 |
2018-05-07 | House | Assigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-04-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-001-000 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass Government Reform; 006-002-000 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Postponed - Government Reform |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Government Reform |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 2A-41 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 7-12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 2405 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |