IL SB2820 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that upon an Interstate highway or fully access controlled freeway, a vehicle may not be driven in the left lane except when otherwise directed by traffic markings, signs, signals, or any person authorized under the Code to direct traffic, in addition to the current exception for overtaking or passing another vehicle. Removes a provision providing that the provision prohibiting vehicles to be driven in the left lane of an Interstate highway or fully access controlled freeway does not apply when no other vehicle is directly behind the vehicle in the left lane.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RIGHT SIDE DRIVING-EXCEPTIONS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-11SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-09SenatePostponed - Transportation
2018-05-03SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-23SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Transportation
2018-02-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-13SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-13SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jim Oberweis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625511-701Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback