IL SB2818 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0799
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0799
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Changes the class of persons who qualify for scholarships and fee waivers granted by the Department of Children and Family Services to youth (rather than children) under care, youth who aged out of care at age 18 or older, or youth (rather than children) formerly under the care who have been adopted or are in a guardianship placement (rather than subsidized guardianship program). Limits the Department's selection of scholarship recipients to students who have earned a high school diploma from an accredited institution or a certificate of general education development (GED), or who have met the State criteria for high school graduation (rather than students who have completed 4 years in an accredited high school). Effective immediately.
Title
DCFS-YOUTH SCHOLARSHIPS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-13 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0799 |
2012-07-13 | Senate | Effective Date July 13, 2012 |
2012-07-13 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2012-05-24 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2012-04-25 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2012-04-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2012-04-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-04-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-04-18 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 008-000-000 |
2012-04-10 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2012-03-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-26 | House | First Reading |
2012-03-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2012-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-03-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Constance A. Howard |
2012-03-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 6, 2012 |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 29, 2012 |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Higher Education; 010-000-000 |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2012-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(c-1) - Referred to Higher Education |
2012-02-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2012-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2012-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-01-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-01-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 505 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |