IL SB2815 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Motor Fuel Tax Law. Provides that a road district, municipality, or county may submit a copy of its approved road budget showing expenses exceeding the motor fuel tax funds received by the road district, municipality, or county to satisfy all documentation and reporting requirements relating to the motor fuel tax funds received. Prohibits the Department of Revenue from requiring more documentation or reporting requirements if a road district, municipality, or county provides the specified budget.
Title
MOTOR FUEL-REPORTING REQUIRED
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-31 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 27, 2016 |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 13, 2016 |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2016 |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 7, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 017-000-000 |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |