IL SB2812 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0934
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0934
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Authorizes the Illinois Pollution Control Board to stay the effectiveness of certain actions taken or permit conditions imposed by the Environmental Protection Agency in the course of administering the Clean Air Act Permit Program (CAAPP). Provides that if the Board stays any contested conditions, then any related conditions from any prior existing permit continue in full force and effect until the Board makes its final decision regarding the appeal of the granted CAAPP permit. Authorizes the Board to stay all the conditions in a CAAPP permit upon a demonstration that the issues raised on appeal can be reasonably expected to affect the CAAPP permit in its entirety. Provides that if the entire CAAPP permit is stayed by the Board, then any prior existing permit continues in full force and effect until the Board makes its final decision regarding the appeal of the granted CAAPP permit. Effective immediately.
Title
EPA-CLEAN AIR PERMITTING
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-21 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0934 | |
2010-06-21 | Effective Date June 21, 2010 | |
2010-06-21 | Governor Approved | |
2010-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-04-28 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-04-28 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 | |
2010-04-23 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-23 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-22 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-21 | Do Pass / Short Debate Environment & Energy Committee; 017-000-000 | |
2010-04-12 | Assigned to Environment & Energy Committee | |
2010-03-25 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-25 | First Reading | |
2010-03-25 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-03-25 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson | |
2010-03-25 | Arrived in House | |
2010-03-24 | Third Reading - Passed; 053-003-000 | |
2010-03-19 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As March 26, 2010 | |
2010-03-18 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 23, 2010 | |
2010-03-18 | Second Reading | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 18, 2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Do Pass as Amended Energy; 009-000-000 | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Energy | |
2010-03-11 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-11 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon | |
2010-03-05 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 19, 2010 | |
2010-03-03 | Postponed - Energy | |
2010-02-10 | Assigned to Energy | |
2010-01-28 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-01-28 | First Reading | |
2010-01-28 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |