IL SB2810 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that "waste" does not include steel slag products. Defines "steel slag products". Effective immediately.
Title
EPA-WASTE-STEEL SLAG
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-07-31 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 13, 2016 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Environment and Conservation |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2016 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2016 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Do Pass Environment and Conservation; 010-000-000 |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Postponed - Environment and Conservation |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 5 | 3.477 | New Code | See Bill Text |
415 | 5 | 3.53 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 5 | 3.535 | Amended Code | Citation Text |