IL SB2808 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that, with certain exceptions in cases of reckless homicide involving the death of 2 or more persons as part of a single course of conduct, in cases involving reckless homicide in which the defendant: (1) was driving at a speed of more than 20 miles per hour in excess of the posted speed limit or (2) failed or refused to comply with a traffic control aide or device engaged in traffic control, the penalty is a Class 2 felony, for which a person, if sentenced to a term of imprisonment, shall be sentenced to a term of not less than 3 years and not more than 14 years. Provides that in cases involving reckless homicide in which the offense was committed as a result of the defendant driving while the defendant's driver's license, permit, or privilege to operate a motor vehicle was suspended or revoked and the defendant caused the deaths of 2 or more persons as part of a single course of conduct, the penalty for reckless homicide is a Class 2 felony, for which a person, if sentenced to a term of imprisonment, shall be sentenced to a term of not less than 6 years and not more than 28 years.
Title
CRIM CD-RECKLESS HOMICIDE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-01-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 9-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2808&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB2808.htm |