IL SB2803 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. Makes a technical change in the short title Section.
Title
REGULATION-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-31 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 13, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 7, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended State Government and Veterans Affairs; 006-000-000 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 1-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |