IL SB2803 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides for issuance of Women Veteran license plates, at an additional initial charge of $15 with eligibility requirements to be determined by the Secretary of State. Provides that the $15 additional initial charge shall be deposited into the Secretary of State Special License Plate Fund. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-WOMEN VET LIC PLATES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-23 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes | |
2010-02-22 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2010-02-17 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter | |
2010-02-16 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon | |
2010-02-16 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez | |
2010-02-11 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval | |
2010-02-11 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein | |
2010-02-10 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski | |
2010-02-10 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland | |
2010-02-10 | Assigned to Transportation | |
2010-01-28 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-01-28 | First Reading | |
2010-01-28 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2803&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB2803.htm |