IL SB2776 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
Pending: Senate Appropriations Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
Pending: Senate Appropriations Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Higher Education Student Assistance Act with respect to the Minority Teachers of Illinois scholarship program. Requires the Illinois Student Assistance Commission to establish and administer a student teaching stipend program. Subject to appropriation, requires the Commission to receive and consider applications for additional funds from recipients of scholarships who are student teaching. Provides that the Commission shall select stipend recipients from among applicants who are in financial need. Provides that certain recipients may receive an additional payment for other expenses during the year in which the recipient is engaged in student teaching. Provides for rulemaking.
Title
HIGHER ED-MINORITY TEACHERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations- Education |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-01-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Natalie Toro |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 947 | 50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2776&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB2776.htm |