IL SB2767 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
Pending: House Agriculture & Conservation Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 3:00 pm in Room 115
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
Pending: House Agriculture & Conservation Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 3:00 pm in Room 115
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Wildlife Code. Provides that it is unlawful to take wild turkey except by use of a bow and arrow or a shotgun of not larger than 10 gauge nor smaller than .410 bore (rather than no smaller than 20 gauge with shot size not larger than No. 4). Provides that the Department of Natural Resources may by administrative rule restrict shot size, material, or density.
Title
WILDLIFE CD-WILD TURKEY-BORE
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Joyce [D] | Sen. Andrew Chesney [R] | Sen. Win Stoller [R] | Sen. Thomas Bennett [R] |
Sen. Jason Plummer [R] | Rep. Harry Benton [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton |
2024-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Bennett |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 22, 2024 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Do Pass Agriculture; 013-000-000 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-01-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
520 | 5 | 2.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |