IL SB2754 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Grade A Pasteurized Milk and Milk Products Act. Removes language requiring the Department of Public Health to charge specific fees and instead directs the Department to determine an application fee for permits by rule. Provides that a permit issued by the Department is required prior to the operation of any milk plant, receiving station, transfer station, cleaning and sanitizing facility, milk hauler sampler, milk tank truck, or certified pasteurizer sealer. Requires the Department to determine and assess a late fee. Effective January 1, 2021.
Title
MILK-PERMITS-FEES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Postponed - Agriculture |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Postponed - Agriculture |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 635 | 5.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2754&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2754.htm |