IL SB2746 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-9)
Status: Passed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0855
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-9)
Status: Passed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0855
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that, beginning January 1, 2017, feminine hygiene products and incontinence products are exempt from the taxes imposed under those Acts. Provides that the Acts' automatic sunset provisions do not apply to that exemption. Effective immediately.
Title
USE/OCC TX-FEMININE HYGIENE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-19 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0855 |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Effective Date August 19, 2016 |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2016-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000 |
2016-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Revenue; 011-000-000 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Revenue |
2016-05-27 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-27 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Melinda Bush |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 29, 2016 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2016-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2016-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2016-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2016-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2016-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2016-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2016-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2016-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2016-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2016-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2016-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-18 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000 |
2016-05-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2016-05-18 | House | Remains in Revenue & Finance Committee |
2016-05-18 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 005-000-000 |
2016-05-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2016-05-13 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2016-05-12 | House | To Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2016-05-09 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2016-05-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2016-05-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2016-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2016-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2016-04-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-22 | House | First Reading |
2016-04-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2016-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2016-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-001-001 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bush |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 012-000-000 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2016 |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Gary Forby |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Matt Murphy |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2016 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 010-000-000 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 105 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |