IL SB2727 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Local Library Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning penalties.
Title
EMERGENCY PHONE SYSTEM BOARD
Sponsors
Sen. Jil Tracy [R] | Rep. Randy Frese [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Public Utilities Committee; 014-000-000 |
2018-05-08 | House | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-02 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2018-05-02 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-001-000 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Tracy |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Telecommunications and Information Technology; 012-001-000 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2018 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Tracy |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Telecommunications and Information Technology |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Telecommunications and Information Technology; 011-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Telecommunications and Information Technology |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Jil Tracy |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 009-000-000 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William E. Brady |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
75 | 5 | 1-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |