IL SB2704 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Assembly Staff Assistants Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the employment and allocation of staff assistants.
Title
STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Sen. Chapin Rose [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2018 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Chapin Rose |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 009-000-000 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William E. Brady |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 160 | 1a | Amended Code | Citation Text |