IL SB2686 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the School Code's construction.
Title
EDUCATION-TECH
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Brady [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 009-000-000 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William E. Brady |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 1-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |