IL SB2677 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1162
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1162
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code and the Mobile Home Local Services Tax Enforcement Act. Provides that a tax deed or a tax certificate of title shall not be issued if a county, city, village, or incorporated town (now, city, village, or incorporated town only) has an interest in the property under the police and welfare power by advancements made from public funds, unless the tax purchaser reimburses the county, city, village or incorporated town or the county, city, village, or town waives its lien on the property.
Title
PROP TX-TAX DEEDS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1162 |
2015-01-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-12-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-001 |
2014-12-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-12-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-12-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-12-02 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 009-000-000 |
2014-11-25 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-05-16 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-24 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2014-04-23 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-03-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-04 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2014-03-04 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 18, 2014 |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 5, 2014 |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 008-000-000 |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-01-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 21-355 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 22-35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 22-40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 516 | 395 | Amended Code | Citation Text |