IL SB2668 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0757
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that all samples used for the purpose of drug testing of Department of Corrections employees shall be collected by persons who have at least 15 (rather than 40) hours of initial training in the proper collection procedures and at least 8 hours of annual follow-up training. Provides that the training of persons who perform the drug testing must include guidelines and procedures on maintaining the integrity of the collection process, ensuring the privacy of employees being tested, ensuring the security of the specimen, and avoiding conduct or statements that could be viewed as offensive or inappropriate (rather than guidelines and procedures used for the collection process and training on the appropriate interpersonal skills required during the collection process). Provides that proficiency in the proper collection process must be demonstrated prior to certification. Effective July 1, 2014.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CD CORR-DOC-DRUG TESTING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-16SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0757
2014-07-16SenateEffective Date July 16, 2014
2014-07-16SenateGovernor Approved
2014-06-06SenateSent to the Governor
2014-05-08SenatePassed Both Houses
2014-05-08HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-002-000
2014-05-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2014-05-07HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2014-05-01HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2014-04-30HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 018-000-000
2014-04-23HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2014-04-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2014-04-03HouseFirst Reading
2014-04-03HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2014-04-03HouseArrived in House
2014-04-02SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2014-03-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 5, 2014
2014-03-04SenateSecond Reading
2014-02-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 25, 2014
2014-02-20SenateDo Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 010-000-000
2014-02-18SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2014-01-29SenateAssigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
2014-01-21SenateReferred to Assignments
2014-01-21SenateFirst Reading
2014-01-21SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73053-7-2.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback