IL SB2657 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Provides that it is an unlawful practice for a person to violate a merchant agreement between a merchant and a credit card service provider. Provides that imposing a surcharge to a debit or credit card or prepaid card purchase if those charges are prohibited by the merchant agreement constitutes a violation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONSUMER FRAUD-MERCH AGREEMENT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-11SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018
2018-05-08SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-08SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2018
2018-04-25SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-04-24SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 009-000-002
2018-04-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Judiciary
2018-04-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Judiciary
2018-04-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-04-17SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2018-04-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Judiciary
2018-04-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Judiciary
2018-04-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary
2018-04-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-04-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-04-11SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Judiciary
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-03-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2018-02-08SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-08SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-08SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8155052VVVNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback