IL SB2640 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0931
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0931
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Police Act. Provides that the Director of State Police shall establish a program to allow a State Police officer who is honorably retiring in good standing to purchase either or both of the following: (i) any State Police badge previously issued to that officer or (ii) if the officer has a currently valid Firearm Owner's Identification Card, the service firearm issued or previously issued to the officer by the Department of State Police. Provides that the cost of the firearm purchased shall be the replacement value of the firearm and not the firearm's fair market value. Amends the State Property Control Act to make conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
STATE POLICE-FIREARMS
Sponsors
Sen. Antonio Munoz [D] | Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] | Rep. John Cabello [R] | Rep. Christopher Davidsmeyer [R] |
Rep. Daniel Burke [D] | Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-17 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0931 |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Effective Date August 17, 2018 |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 005-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government |
2018-05-25 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-25 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 28, 2018 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-05-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000 |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-15 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2018-05-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2018-05-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2018-05-08 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-04 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2018-05-03 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Muñoz |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 006-000-000 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 006-000-000 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Muñoz |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 007-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 006-000-000 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2610 | 17b | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 605 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |