IL SB2640 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unemployment Insurance Act. Provides that none of the amount received by an individual as primary social security old age and disability retirement benefits shall constitute disqualifying income.
Title
UNEMPLOY INS-SOCIAL SECURITY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-04 | Held in Labor | |
2010-02-25 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford | |
2010-02-25 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2010-02-24 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes | |
2010-02-24 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Bond | |
2010-02-24 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Deanna Demuzio | |
2010-02-23 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez | |
2010-02-18 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson | |
2010-02-17 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler | |
2010-02-10 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. M. Maggie Crotty | |
2010-02-10 | Assigned to Labor | |
2010-02-08 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John M. Sullivan | |
2010-01-28 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-01-28 | First Reading | |
2010-01-28 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather Steans |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2640&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB2640.htm |