IL SB2628 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Enterprise Zone Act. Provides that Enterprise Zones shall be in effect for 50 calendar years (instead of 30 calendar years) unless a shorter period of time is specified in the certified designating ordinance. Amends the Public Utilities Act to make conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
ENTERPRISE ZONE-EXTEND
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Bivins [R] | Sen. Gary Dahl [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-04 | Postponed - Commerce | |
2010-03-03 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins | |
2010-02-18 | Postponed - Commerce | |
2010-02-10 | Assigned to Commerce | |
2010-01-21 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-01-21 | First Reading | |
2010-01-21 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Gary G. Dahl |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2628&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB2628.htm |