IL SB2618 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0796
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0796
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Extends the repeal date of the Environmental Health Practitioner Licensing Act from January 1, 2019 to January 1, 2029. Amends the Environmental Health Practitioner Licensing Act. Provides that applicants and licensees shall provide the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation with a valid address and email address and inform the Department of any changes within 14 days. Makes changes to the grounds by which the Department may refuse to issue, renew, revoke, suspend, or discipline a license because of the applicant's or licensee's criminal history. Removes duplicate provisions concerning record of proceedings. Adds provisions concerning confidentiality of a complaint against a licensee. Replaces "Director" with "Secretary" in order to update references to the Secretary of Financial and Professional Regulation. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
ENV HEALTH LICENSE-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-29 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0796 |
2018-08-10 | Senate | Effective Date August 10, 2018 |
2018-08-10 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-000 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 007-000-000 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-05-22 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-22 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 23, 2018 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-000-000 |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-05-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 015-000-000 |
2018-04-26 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2018-04-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-17 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-17 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-04-17 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-000-000 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 37 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 37 | 100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 37 | 105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 37 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 37 | 115 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 37 | 123 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 37 | 125 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 37 | 130 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 37 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 37 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 37 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 37 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 37 | 45 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
225 | 37 | 60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 37 | 65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 37 | 70 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 37 | 75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 37 | 80 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 37 | 85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 37 | 90 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 37 | 95 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.29 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.39 | New Code | See Bill Text |