IL SB2609 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that the period within which a prosecution must be commenced does not include any period from the time the evidence of a sexual assault is collected using the Illinois State Police sexual assault evidence collection kit until the completion of the analysis of the collected evidence.
Title
CRIM CD-EXCLUDED LIMITATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2014-05-16 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2014-04-28 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-04-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2014-04-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2014-04-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey |
2014-04-22 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Deborah Conroy |
2014-04-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2014-04-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2014-04-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Jefferson |
2014-04-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2014-04-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2014-04-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2014-04-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2014-04-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2014-04-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-07 | House | First Reading |
2014-04-07 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey |
2014-04-07 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 4, 2014 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 27, 2014 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 008-001-001 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Noland |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2013-10-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-10-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-10-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Noland |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 3-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |