IL SB2600 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Tax Increment Allocation Redevelopment Act. Provides that the redevelopment project in the TIF district created by an ordinance that was adopted on April 28, 2003 by the City of Gibson City must be completed by December 31 of the 35th year (now, the 23rd year) after the year in which the ordinance was adopted. Effective immediately.
Title
TIF- GIBSON CITY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2013-10-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-10-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-10-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 11-74.4-3.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2600&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB2600.htm |