IL SB2592 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Emergency Management Agency Act. Provides that the Illinois Emergency Management Agency shall establish guidelines by rule for the expenditure of the funds in the Homeland Security Preparedness Fund with input provided by a statewide interagency organization and public safety multidisciplinary organizations established to advise the Director of the Illinois Emergency Management Agency regarding public safety preparedness. Provides that the Illinois Emergency Management Agency shall spend the moneys in the fund to enhance State and local homeland security preparedness, all risk disaster response readiness, and statewide public safety mutual aid. Amends the State Finance Act to create the Homeland Security Preparedness Fund. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that, beginning with the 2017 registration year, a $3 surcharge shall be collected in addition to other registration fees for motor vehicles of the first division, motorcycles, motor driven cycles, pedalcycles, and vehicles registered in the 8,000 lb. and less flat weight plate category to be deposited into the Homeland Security Preparedness Fund for the Illinois Emergency Management Agency to use as directed under the Illinois Emergency Management Agency Act. Provides that this surcharge shall not apply to registration of vehicles by units of local, State, or federal government and other specified organizations.
Title
IEMA: HOMELAND SECURITY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3305 | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 5.875 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 3-806 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-815 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2592&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2592.htm |