IL SB2581 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that on and after July 1, 2020, a detention screening instrument shall be used for referrals to all authorized juvenile detention facilities in this State prior to a judicial hearing. Provides a minor alleged to be a delinquent minor taken into temporary custody must be brought before a judicial officer within 48 hours (rather than 40 hours, excluding Saturdays, Sundays and court designated holidays). Provides that if an appearance is required of any minor taken and held in a place of custody or confinement operated by the State or any of its political subdivisions, including counties and municipalities, the chief judge of the circuit may permit by rule for the minor's personal appearance to be made by means of two-way audio-visual communication, including closed circuit television and computerized video conference, in the following proceedings: the initial appearance before a judge; a detention or shelter care hearing; or any status hearing. Amends the Probation and Probation Officers Act. Provides that the Division of Probation Services of the Supreme Court shall adopt a statewide juvenile detention screening instrument that has been verified through evidence-based and data-based practices that is to be used by all authorized juvenile detention facilities. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JUV CT-DETENTION SCREENING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-03-21HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-03-21HouseFirst Reading
2018-03-13HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-03-13HouseArrived in House
2018-03-13SenateThird Reading - Passed; 049-000-000
2018-02-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 27, 2018
2018-02-22SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2018
2018-02-21SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 007-001-001
2018-02-14SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2018-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7054055-410Amended CodeCitation Text
7054055-415Amended CodeCitation Text
7054055-420New CodeSee Bill Text
73011015Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback