IL SB2559 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963 relating to progress reports of defendants found unfit to stand trial. Provides that whenever the court is sent a report from the supervisor of the defendant's treatment, the treatment provider shall arrange for the return of the defendant to the county jail within a specified period before the discharge hearing. Provides that the discharge hearing shall be held within 14 (rather than 120) days of the filing of a motion for a discharge hearing, unless good cause is demonstrated why the hearing cannot be held or the delay is occasioned by the defendant. Effective immediately.
Title
DHS-REPORTS-CRIMINAL PROCEDURE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-17 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1020 |
2012-08-17 | Senate | Effective Date August 17, 2012 |
2012-08-17 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2012-06-20 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2012-05-22 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2012-05-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-001-000 |
2012-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 005-002-000 |
2012-05-03 | House | Remains in Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee |
2012-05-03 | House | Motion Do Pass - Lost Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 004-005-000 |
2012-04-25 | House | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee |
2012-04-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-04-24 | House | First Reading |
2012-04-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2012-04-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-04-23 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Constance A. Howard |
2012-03-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Haine |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 007-000-000 |
2012-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2012-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2012 |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 8, 2012 |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 008-000-000 |
2012-02-29 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2012-02-23 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2012-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2012-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-01-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-01-11 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
725 | 5 | 104-18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 5 | 104-23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |