IL SB2558 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $2 from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Agriculture for its FY 14 ordinary and contingent expenses.
Title
$DEPT OF AGRICULTURE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2558&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/PDF/09800SB2558.pdf |