IL SB2544 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Vetoed on August 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Bill Dead - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Bill Dead - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Local Government Reduction and Efficiency Division of the Counties Code. Provides that the findings on an audit of a unit that has been proposed to be dissolved shall be reported within 30 days, or as soon thereafter as is practicable, (rather than 30 days) after the chairman of the board requests the audit. Provides that a county board may adopt an ordinance authorizing the dissolution of a unit not less than 60 days (rather than 150 days) following the court's appointment of a trustee-in-dissolution (rather than after the effective date of the ordinance). Makes other changes.
Title
LOCAL GOVERNMENT REDUCTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 77 N: 35 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 77 N: 35 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-28 | Senate | Bill Dead - Amendatory Veto |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Sen. Terry Link |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto November 14, 2018 |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Governor Amendatory Veto |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-06-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 045-005-001 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 009-004-001 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Terry Link |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Terry Link |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2018 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 077-035-000 |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-05-25 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2018-05-25 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-05-25 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-05-25 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-25 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee |
2018-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee; 010-000-000 |
2018-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-04-26 | House | Assigned to Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-13 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2018-03-13 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-000 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Do Pass Government Reform; 009-000-000 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Government Reform |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 5-44025 | Amended Code | Citation Text |