IL SB2514 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0981
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0981
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Probate Act of 1975. Provides that an attorney for a representative is entitled to reasonable compensation for the attorney's services and that an attorney who withdraws from representing a representative must file a petition for fees and costs within 30 after the withdrawal is approved by the court (instead of an attorney for a representative is entitled to reasonable compensation for the attorney's services). Effective July 1, 2010.
Title
PROBATE-ATTY WITHDRAW-FEE PET
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-02 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0981 | |
2010-07-02 | Effective Date July 2, 2010 | |
2010-07-02 | Governor Approved | |
2010-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-04-21 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-04-21 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 | |
2010-04-20 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-20 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-14 | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 016-000-000 | |
2010-04-08 | Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee | |
2010-03-17 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-17 | First Reading | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-03-17 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. John E. Bradley | |
2010-03-16 | Arrived in House | |
2010-03-16 | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2010 | |
2010-03-11 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Silverstein | |
2010-03-11 | Second Reading | |
2010-02-23 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 007-000-000 | |
2010-02-23 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary | |
2010-02-22 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-22 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein | |
2010-02-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 18, 2010 | |
2010-02-17 | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 009-000-000 | |
2010-02-16 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted | |
2010-02-16 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary | |
2010-02-11 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-11 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein | |
2010-02-10 | Assigned to Judiciary | |
2010-01-12 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-01-12 | First Reading | |
2010-01-12 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |