IL SB2467 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Provisions and State Employee Articles of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that the alternative retirement annuity under the State Employee Article applies to a security employee of the Department of Human Services subject to the Tier 2 provisions. Provides that a security employee of the Department of Human Services subject to the Tier 2 provisions may convert up to 8 years of service credit established before the effective date of the amendatory Act as a security employee of the Department of Human Services under the State Employee Article into eligible creditable service by filing a written election with the Board under that Article, accompanied by a specified payment. Excludes a benefit increase resulting from the amendatory Act from the definition of "new benefit increase". Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-SERS-ALTERNATE ANNUITY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Government Accountability and Ethics |
2020-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-01-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-01-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Paul Schimpf |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 1-160 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 14-110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 14-152.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2467&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2467.htm |