IL SB2467 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Defines "servicemember" and "veteran". Provides that a person commits aggravated assault or aggravated battery when he or she commits an assault or a battery against a servicemember or veteran. Provides that an aggravated assault committed against a servicemember or veteran is a Class A misdemeanor. Provides that an aggravated battery committed against a servicemember or veteran is a Class 3 felony.
Title
AGG ASSAULT&BAT-VET&SERVICEMEM
Sponsors
Sen. Julie Morrison [D] | Sen. Michael Hastings [D] | Sen. Thomas Cullerton [D] | Rep. Katie Stuart [D] |
Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D] | Rep. Jerry Costello [D] | Rep. Daniel Swanson [R] | Rep. Michael McAuliffe [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-04-26 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-19 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-04-19 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Reported Back To Criminal Law; 003-000-000 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 12-0.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12-3.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |