IL SB2452 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Sanitary District Act of 1936. Provides that the Lakes Region Sanitary District may dissolve itself upon entering into a dissolution agreement with Lake County for the county to acquire all of the assets and responsibilities of the district. Provides that upon dissolution of the district, the statutory powers of the former district shall be exercised by the county board of Lake County. Provides that no later than 60 days after the effective date of the dissolution, Lake County shall notify the Illinois Environmental Protection Agency of the dissolution of the Lakes Region Sanitary District and providing a copy of the dissolution agreement to the Agency. Makes conforming changes.
Title
LAKES REGION SANITARY-DISSOLVE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-09-30 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-05-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-15 | House | To Government Consolidation Analysis Subcommittee |
2018-04-26 | House | Assigned to Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-02-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-001-000 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 21, 2018 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Do Pass Government Reform; 007-000-001 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Government Reform |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 2805 | 33 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 2805 | 33.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 2805 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |