IL SB2443 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Drycleaner Environmental Response Trust Fund Act. Provides that notwithstanding any other law to the contrary, the Drycleaner Environmental Response Trust Fund is not subject to sweeps, administrative charge-backs, or any other fiscal maneuver that would in any way transfer any amounts from the Fund into any other fund of the State. Effective immediately.
Title
DRYCLEANER RESPONSE TRUST FUND
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 To Subcommittee on Drycleaners |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Drycleaners |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Re-assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Re-assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 To Subcommittee on Drycleaners |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Drycleaners |
2018-04-12 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Drycleaners |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Re-referred to Environment and Conservation |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Environment and Conservation |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Re-referred to Environment and Conservation |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - State Government |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 135 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |