IL SB2443 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that a foreclosure complaint shall include a statement of the capacity in which the plaintiff brings the foreclosure such as legal holder of the indebtedness, pledgee, agent, trustee under a trust deed or otherwise, along with copies of documents upon which the plaintiff relies and which show the plaintiff to be the legal holder of the indebtedness, a pledgee, an agent, the trustee under a trust deed or otherwise (instead of a statement of the capacity in which the plaintiff brings the foreclosure and indicates whether plaintiff is the legal holder of the indebtedness, a pledgee, an agent, the trustee under a trust deed or otherwise). Provides that a foreclosure judgment shall include: allegations of fact in the complaint that are not denied by the verified answer or counterclaim (instead of not denied by the verified answer or counterclaim or where the defendant states in an affidavit that he or she has no knowledge sufficient to form a belief) are sufficient evidence thereof; the last date for redemption; court rulings as to each request for relief; tangible evidence of who holds the indebtedness, the indebtedness, and the mortgage foreclosed (instead of the indebtedness and the mortgage foreclosed) shall be exhibited to and filed with the court; and if the plaintiff is not the original mortgagee, specific findings of fact concerning the plaintiff's capacity to bring the foreclosure action and a determination of whether this capacity legally entitles the plaintiff to bring the action (instead of a foreclosure judgment shall include the last date for redemption and court rulings as to each request for relief). Effective immediately.
Title
CIV PRO-FORECLOSURE ASSIGNMNT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-03 | To Financial Institutions Subcommittee on Mortgages | |
2010-02-10 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes | |
2010-02-10 | Assigned to Financial Institutions | |
2009-03-24 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-24 | First Reading | |
2009-03-24 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2443&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB2443.htm |