IL SB2439 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 24 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends various acts to remove provisions allowing or requiring licensing authorities to revoke professional licenses for defaulting on an educational loan provided by or guaranteed by the Illinois Student Assistance Commission. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LICENSES-EDUCATIONAL LOAN-ISAC

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-24SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-003-000
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 009-000-000
2018-05-16HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-05-08HouseAssigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-03HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-05-03HouseArrived in House
2018-05-02SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass as Amended Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000
2018-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-02-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2018-02-22SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-02-21SenatePostponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-02-21SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-21SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-02-15SenatePostponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-02-08SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-02-07SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-01-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-30SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-30SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105521B-75Amended CodeCitation Text
2021052105-15Amended CodeCitation Text
2021052105-207Amended CodeCitation Text
20331080Repealed CodeCitation Text
2155500-70Amended CodeCitation Text
22510780Amended CodeCitation Text
22510975Amended CodeCitation Text
22511016Amended CodeCitation Text
22511525Amended CodeCitation Text
22513075Amended CodeCitation Text
22513595Amended CodeCitation Text
2253095Amended CodeCitation Text
22530522Amended CodeCitation Text
22531013Amended CodeCitation Text
22532524Amended CodeCitation Text
22533027Amended CodeCitation Text
22534020Amended CodeCitation Text
2253735Amended CodeCitation Text
22540720-20Amended CodeCitation Text
2254115-75Amended CodeCitation Text
2254104-7Amended CodeCitation Text
22541275Amended CodeCitation Text
22541523Amended CodeCitation Text
2254259Amended CodeCitation Text
22542785Amended CodeCitation Text
22543014Amended CodeCitation Text
22544115-10Amended CodeCitation Text
22544740-35Repealed CodeCitation Text
22545020.01Amended CodeCitation Text
22545420-20Amended CodeCitation Text
22545815-45Repealed CodeCitation Text
2255585Amended CodeCitation Text
2255745Amended CodeCitation Text
22563110Amended CodeCitation Text
2257519Amended CodeCitation Text
2258490Amended CodeCitation Text
4204445Amended CodeCitation Text
7052051Amended CodeCitation Text
81558Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback