IL SB2437 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 9 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-09 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Chicago Teacher Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that, in addition to certain listed items, reported payroll data must include any and all other data necessary for the Fund to calculate pension benefits. Provides that any necessary amendments or corrections to certified data provided by the employer must be made within one year after the certified data is received by the Fund. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-CHG TCHR-PAYROLL RECORD

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-01-09 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-09 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 91 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-09SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-01-09SenateSenate Concurs
2017-01-09SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 6 Senate Concurs 041-000-002
2017-01-09SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 041-000-002
2017-01-09Senate3/5 Vote Required
2017-01-09SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 6 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-01-09SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-01-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3, 6 - January 9, 2017
2017-01-09SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-01-01SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2016-12-01SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 6 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2016-12-01SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 6 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John J. Cullerton
2016-12-01SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2016-12-01SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John J. Cullerton
2016-12-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3, 6 - December 1, 2016
2016-12-01SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3, 6
2016-12-01HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 091-016-000
2016-12-01House3/5 Vote Required
2016-12-01HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2016-12-01HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 6 Adopted
2016-12-01HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Withdrawn by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2016-12-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2016-12-01HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 6 Recommends Be Adopted Personnel and Pensions Committee; 005-002-000
2016-11-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 6 Rules Refers to Personnel and Pensions Committee
2016-11-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 6 Referred to Rules Committee
2016-11-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 6 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2016-11-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Rules Committee
2016-11-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2016-11-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Personnel and Pensions Committee; 006-002-000
2016-11-29SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
2016-11-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Personnel and Pensions Committee
2016-11-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
2016-11-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2016-11-15HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2016-11-15HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2016-11-15HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2016-11-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2016-11-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2016-11-15HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Personnel and Pensions Committee; 007-002-000
2016-11-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted in Personnel and Pensions Committee; by Voice Vote
2016-11-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Personnel and Pensions Committee
2016-11-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2016-11-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2016-11-14HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2016-11-09HouseAssigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee
2016-06-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2016-06-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2016-06-30HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2016-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2016
2016-05-27HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2016
2016-05-13HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016
2016-05-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Personnel and Pensions Committee
2016-05-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel and Pensions Committee
2016-05-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2016-05-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2016-05-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2016-05-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2016-05-02HouseAssigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee
2016-04-21HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2016-04-21HouseFirst Reading
2016-04-21HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2016-04-21HouseArrived in House
2016-04-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2016-04-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2016-04-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2016-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2016
2016-04-20SenateSecond Reading
2016-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments
2016-04-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2016-04-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2016-03-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 3, 2016
2016-03-02SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-000-000
2016-02-17SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2016-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2016-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2016-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40517-132Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2437&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2437.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2437eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2437enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2437sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2437ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2437ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2437ham003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2437ham004.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2437ham005.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2437ham006.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/99/senate/09900SB2437_04212016_006000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/99/house/09900SB2437_12012016_006000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/99/senate/09900SB2437_01092017_001001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/99/senate/09900SB2437_01092017_001000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback