IL SB2432 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that a summons that otherwise complies with Supreme Court Rules and is properly served is not invalidated and the court's jurisdiction is not affected by an error in format. Provides that a summons is not defective if the named defendant is listed on a document attached to the summons. Provides that the changes to the Code of Civil Procedure are declarative of existing law set forth by the Illinois Supreme Court in Fleshner v. Copeland, 13 Ill.2d 72 (1958). Amends the Mortgage Rescue Fraud Act. Provides that it is a violation for a distressed property consultant to, among other things, enter into, enforce, or act upon any agreement with a foreclosure defendant, whether the foreclosure is completed or otherwise, if the agreement provides for a division of proceeds between the foreclosure defendant and the distressed property consultant derived from litigation related to the foreclosure. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SUMMONS/FORECLOSURE PROCEEDS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-30HouseMotion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2018-05-30HouseMotion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2018-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-012-001
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-30HouseHousing Affordability Impact Note Filed
2018-05-29HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-05-29HouseJudicial Note Filed
2018-05-28HouseJudicial Note Requested by Rep. André Thapedi
2018-05-28HouseHousing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. André Thapedi
2018-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 007-001-000
2018-05-24HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2018-05-24HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000
2018-05-22HouseTo Civil Procedure Subcommittee
2018-05-16HouseRemains in Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-05-16HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 001-002-000; -FAILED
2018-05-09HouseTo Civil Procedure Subcommittee
2018-05-02HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-04-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-000-000
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Mulroe
2018-04-19SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 011-000-000
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-04-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-02-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 21, 2018
2018-02-20SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-02-14SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000
2018-02-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2018-02-07SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2018-01-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-30SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-30SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73552-201Amended CodeCitation Text
76594050Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback