IL SB2429 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall provide dental services to an adult who is otherwise eligible for assistance under the medical assistance program. Provides that targeted dental services, as set forth in a specified exhibit in a federal consent decree, that are provided to adults under the medical assistance program shall be reimbursed at the rates set forth in a specified column in the exhibit for targeted dental services that are provided to persons under the age of 18 under the medical assistance program. Requires the Department to actively monitor the contractual relationship between Managed Care Organizations (MCOs) and a dental administrator contracted by an MCO to provide dental services. Contains provisions concerning the Department's adoption of appropriate data and measures; the inclusion of certain dental performance measures in the Department's Health Plan Comparison Tool and Illinois Medicaid Plan Report Card; and the collection of information about the types of contracted, broad-based care coordination occurring between a MCO and any dental administrator. Prohibits a health plan from attempting to limit the right of medical assistance recipients to obtain dental services from a qualified Medicaid provider. Prohibits the Department from adopting a rule or entering into a contract that prohibits a licensed dentist or dental hygienist from receiving reimbursement under the medical assistance program for a dental encounter. Effective immediately.
Title
MEDICAID-ADULT DENTAL SERVICES
Sponsors
Sen. Omar Aquino [D] | Sen. Pat McGuire [D] | Sen. William Haine [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] |
Sen. Cristina Castro [D] | Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] | Sen. Laura Fine [D] | Rep. Mary Flowers [D] |
Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 14 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-05-10 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-05-10 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-05-08 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-05-03 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-05-03 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 039-014-000 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Aquino |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 006-002-000 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Human Services; 006-001-000 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Human Services |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Human Services |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |