IL SB2421 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1036
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1036
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Authorizes the issuance or renewal of a license authorizing the sale of alcoholic liquor at premises located within 100 feet of a specific church located in the City of Chicago. Effective immediately.
Title
LIQUOR-SALE NEAR CHURCH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 87 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 87 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-22 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1036 |
2018-08-22 | Senate | Effective Date August 22, 2018 |
2018-08-22 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 049-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 014-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2018 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 087-027-000 |
2018-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-23 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2018-05-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 009-000-000 |
2018-04-26 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-02-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 046-000-000 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 27, 2018 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 20, 2018 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 014-000-000 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
235 | 5 | 6-11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |