IL SB2419 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1123
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1123
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Registered Surgical Assistant and Registered Surgical Technologist Title Protection Act. Provides that a person qualifies for registration as a surgical assistant if he or she is currently certified by the National Commission for the Certification of Surgical Assistants (rather than the National Surgical Assistant Association). Provides that in order for a registrant to renew his or her surgical assistant registration or surgical technologist registration, he or she must maintain certain current certification. Effective immediately.
Title
SURGICAL ASSISTS-CERTIFICATION
Sponsors
Sen. Iris Martinez [D] | Sen. Pamela Althoff [R] | Sen. Dan McConchie [R] | Rep. Daniel Burke [D] |
Rep. Michael McAuliffe [R] | Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] | Sen. Michael Halpin [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-11-27 - House - Motion in House (Y: 75 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-11-14 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 54 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 85 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-14 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 54 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 85 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-29 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1123 |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Effective Date November 27, 2018 |
2018-11-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Amendatory Veto Overridden Both Houses |
2018-11-27 | House | Override Amendatory Veto - House Passed 075-035-000 |
2018-11-27 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-19 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-11-19 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2018-11-19 | House | Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2018-11-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto |
2018-11-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Override Amendatory Veto - Senate Passed 054-002-000 |
2018-11-14 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto November 14, 2018 |
2018-09-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-09-10 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-09-10 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Governor Amendatory Veto |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 085-025-000 |
2018-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-05-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 013-001-000 |
2018-05-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2018-04-26 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2018-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-01 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2018-02-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 21, 2018 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 20, 2018 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-000-000 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 130 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 130 | 60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |