IL SB2412 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Car-Sharing Program Act. Provides that nothing in the Act shall be construed to extend beyond insurance or have any implications for other State law unless specifically provided. Adds provisions governing: insurance coverage requirements during car-sharing periods; notification of implications of lien; exclusions in motor vehicle liability insurance policies; recordkeeping requirements; vicarious liability; contribution against indemnification; insurable interests; consumer protection disclosures; driver's license verification; data retention; responsibility for equipment; and automobile safety recalls. Effective January 1, 2023.
Title
CAR-SHARING PROGRAM ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-15 | Senate | To Executive- Procurement |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2412&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2412.htm |