IL SB2411 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0578
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0578
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. In provisions concerning enterprise risk filings, describes insurance holding company systems that are required to file an annual group capital calculation and those that are exempt from filing a group capital calculation. Provides that the ultimate controlling person of every insurer subject to registration and scoped into the NAIC Liquidity Stress Test Framework shall file the results of a specific year's liquidity stress test. Sets forth restrictions on insurer publishing. In provisions concerning credit allowed for domestic ceding insurers, provides terms by which credit is allowed for reinsurance. Provides that credit shall be allowed when reinsurance is ceded to an assuming insurer that meets specified conditions. Provides that the Director shall timely create and publish a list of reciprocal jurisdictions. Provides that the Director shall timely create and publish a list of assuming insurers that have satisfied specified conditions and to which cessions shall be granted. Provides that the Director may revoke or suspend the eligibility of the assuming insurer. Provides that the ceding insurer or its representative may seek and obtain an order requiring that the assuming insurer post security for all outstanding ceded liabilities under specified conditions. Provides that credit may be taken only for reinsurance agreements entered into, amended, or renewed on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act and only for losses incurred and reported on or after specified dates. Provides that the amendatory Act shall not limit or in any way alter the capacity of parties to a reinsurance agreement to agree on requirements for security or other terms in that reinsurance agreement except as expressly prohibited by applicable law or regulation, shall not authorize an assuming insurer to withdraw or reduce the security provided under any reinsurance agreement except as permitted by the terms of the agreement, and shall not limit or in any way alter the capacity of parties to any reinsurance agreement to renegotiate the agreement. Defines "group capital calculation instructions", "NAIC Liquidity Stress Test Framework", and "scope criteria". Makes other changes. Effective December 31, 2022.
Title
INS CODE-REINSURANCE CREDITS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-24 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0578 |
2021-08-24 | Senate | Effective Date December 31, 2022 |
2021-08-24 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 116-000-000 |
2021-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-20 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Insurance Committee; 018-000-000 |
2021-05-13 | House | Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2021-05-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-11 | House | First Reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2021-05-07 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 5, 2021 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2021 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2021 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Insurance; 010-000-000 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 131.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 131.14b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 131.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 131.22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 131.22a | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 5 | 131.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 173.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 35B-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |