IL SB2394 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $2 from the General Revenue Fund to the Illinois Commerce Commission for its FY12 ordinary and contingent expenses. Effective July 1, 2011.
Title
$VARIOUS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 34 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2012-07-27 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-05-23 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-23 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2012-05-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2012-05-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2012-05-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-05-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2012-04-25 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2011-07-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2011-05-16 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2011-05-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-16 | House | First Reading |
2011-05-16 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2011-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-05-16 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 034-022-001 |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Kotowski |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Kotowski |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Re-referred to Assignments |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1) - Referred to Appropriations II |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 5, 2011 |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Kotowski |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2011-05-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Held in Appropriations II |
2011-05-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Appropriations II |
2011-05-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2011 |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 6, 2011 |
2011-03-31 | Senate | Do Pass Appropriations II; 007-002-000 |
2011-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations II |
2011-03-01 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2011-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-15 | Senate | Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2011-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan |